+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 282
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate miscellaneous motion: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Antenori flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to suspend a portion of Senate rule 8a-3 for the purpose of returning House bill 2358 to the calendar of the committee of the whole. motion carried.
- Miscellaneous motion
- 0 0 0 0
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:10 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Senate first read
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: ENR
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to ENR - Pratt
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass amended
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Energy and Natural Resources
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Pratt Substitute Floor Amendment to the Energy and Natural Resources Committee Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Energy and Natural Resources
House Adopted Amendment
Pratt Substitute Floor Amendment to the Energy and Natural Resources Committee Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Energy and Natural Resources
House Adopted Amendment
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-3 nrt
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 20, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
April 20, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 28, 2011: Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
February 24, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 20, 2011: Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 20, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9