+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Kavanagh flr amend (ref FIN)
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: RED
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Rural and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Rural and Economic Development
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Kavanagh flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rural and Economic Development
House Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rural and Economic Development
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 31, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 17
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2015: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
January 28, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 28, 2015: Rural and Economic Development: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1