+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 1 e
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:11 pm
- Third read: Passed
- Senate miscellaneous motion: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- 0 0 0 0
- Miscellaneous motion
- Senator biggs moved that a portion of Senate rule 8a-3 be suspended for the purpose of allowing the placement of hb 2356 which has not been on the consent calendar for the 48-hour notice period for the purpose of placement on the third reading calendar. motion carried.
- Transmitted to: Governor
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Fann
- Third read: Passed
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 4:00 pmobject
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Fann Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
2-14 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
Fann Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 14, 2012: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 9, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 5
January 18, 2012: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor