+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed as am
- Floor Amend to Health - Friese - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Carter - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (8)
Health
House Proposed Amendment
Health
House Proposed Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Health - Friese - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Carter - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
May 7, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 16, 2016: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 11, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 11, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2016: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
January 25, 2016: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor