+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 147
- Action: Signed
On April 28, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 24, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:42 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: TRANS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
3-28 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 24, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
March 17, 2008: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
March 11, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 24, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 24, 2008: Transportation: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor