+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 90
- Action: Signed
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate first read
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Ash
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 12:31 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ash Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ash Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-3 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 7, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
April 5, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 28, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
February 24, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 26, 2011: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 26, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor