+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:10PM.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (8)
February 16, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 16, 2016: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 25, 2016: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor