+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Kern moved that the House reconsider HB 2352 within the next 14 days. Motion passed by v/v.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Carter - withdrawn
- MVRA - passed
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 4:00PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 35
January 26, 2017: House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor