+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 22, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 65
- Action: Signed
On April 16, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-24fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2008: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 24, 2008: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor