+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 23, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 135
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Aboud flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:35 pmobject
On April 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Veterans and Military Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 1, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Gowan
- Third read: Passed
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Gowan Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Gowan Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-5 vma
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 19, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
April 5, 2010: Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 1, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
January 20, 2010: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 20, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor