+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- RULES (ref APPROP) withdrawn
- Smith flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee: do pass.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- MAPS - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (10)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Smith flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (14)
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 54
May 6, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
April 27, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
April 27, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 5
March 14, 2016: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
March 14, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 14, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 14, 2016: Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 1, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor