+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 205
- Action: Signed
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 3:10 pm
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Senate first read
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to GOV - Reeve
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
- Health and Human Services: Withdrawn
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Reeve Floor Amendment; Reference to GOVERNMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
3-12 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
Reeve Floor Amendment; Reference to GOVERNMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 17
February 6, 2012: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor