+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting House action on Senate amendments
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Court
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 4:00 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Court floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Court floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-19 fin_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
3-13 fin_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2012: Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 20, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 7
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 17, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor