+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 188
- Action: Signed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Yarbrough flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Lesko #2
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Lesko #1
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 1:59 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Yarbrough flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Lesko Floor Amendment #2; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Lesko Floor Amendment #1; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Lesko Floor Amendment #2; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Yarbrough flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Lesko Floor Amendment #1; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-11 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 2, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2013: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 20, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2013: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1