+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 226
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:00 pm
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to GOV - Lesko
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Lesko Floor Amendment; Reference to GOVERNMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Lesko Floor Amendment; Reference to GOVERNMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
3-11 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 7, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 6
March 5, 2013: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
January 22, 2013: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor