+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 210 rfeir
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce amd Workforce Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed 1
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:03 pm
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Insurance: Do pass
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Insurance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2015: Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 19, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
January 28, 2015: Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor