+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
June 13, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2013: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2013: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 14
January 22, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor