+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: MAPS
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 17
January 17, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1