+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- FMFR (ref Bill) adopted
- Smith flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee: do pass amended.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- FSR
- SUB Floor Amend to FSR - Townsend - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Federalism and States' Rights Committee: do pass amended.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism and States' Rights Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (11)
Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility
Senate Proposed Amendment
Federalism and States' Rights
House Proposed Amendment
Federalism and States' Rights
House Proposed Amendment
Smith flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility
Senate Adopted Amendment
SUB Floor Amend to FSR - Townsend - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Federalism and States' Rights
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 5, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 3
May 5, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
April 11, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 11, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
March 1, 2016: Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2016: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 25, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 22
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 22
January 25, 2016: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 25, 2016: House Federalism and States' Rights Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2