+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 238
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: APPROP
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
3-8 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 18, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor