+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 17, 2023 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 11, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
March 6, 2023: Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 28, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
January 25, 2023: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 14
January 25, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor