+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 123
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 12:05 pm
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: PIR
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Public Institutions and Retirement: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Public Institutions and Retirement
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Public Institutions and Retirement
House Adopted Amendment
3-26 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
Public Institutions and Retirement
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 18, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
March 14, 2007: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 13, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
January 22, 2007: Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 22, 2007: Public Institutions and Retirement: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor