+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
- Motion to reconsider
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Failed in House on third reading on reconsideraton
- Motion to reconsider
- Motion to reconsider
- Motion to reconsider
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
March 26, 2008: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 30
March 13, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 18, 2008: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor