+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pmobject
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Barton
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Barton Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Barton Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
March 13, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 4
February 3, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 3, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor