+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Gress - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 14, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
March 14, 2023: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 14, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
March 8, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 15
January 26, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 1
January 26, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 26, 2023: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor