+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Crandell flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Judiciary: Do pass
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: JUD
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Crandell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth E Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
House Adopted Amendment
Farnsworth E Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Crandell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 17, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 3
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 17, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 13, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 4
January 28, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor