+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee.
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Shah - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 6, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 6, 2023: Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 28, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
January 26, 2023: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 15
January 26, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8