+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 147
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pmobject
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
March 17, 2014: Public Safety: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 13, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
January 22, 2014: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor