+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 16, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 69
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 3:05 pm
On March 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass
On March 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2010: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 24, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 19, 2010: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 19, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor