+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Rodriguez - passed
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:05PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2021: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 14
January 26, 2021: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 26, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor