+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Engrossed Bill - Pratt - passed
- Representative Toma motioned that pursuant to House Rule 12(O) House Bill 2333 be referred to an Additional Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Pratt - passed
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:05PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
January 26, 2021: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 10
January 26, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor