+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 253
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: HEIR
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Withdrawn
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Higher Education, Innovation and Reform - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-21 approp_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 11, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
April 10, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 19, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 14
January 17, 2012: Higher Education, Innovation and Reform: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor