+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Bolding - failed by s/v
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:43PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (3)
February 8, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
January 16, 2018: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
January 16, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor