+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 11, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 331
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Jones
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Jones Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Jones Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 30, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2012: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
January 17, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 1
January 17, 2012: Agriculture and Water: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor