+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
- Senate Water and Energy Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Water and Energy Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (12)
March 3, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2016: Water and Energy: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 3, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 3, 2016: Senate Water and Energy Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 6
March 1, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2016: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
January 21, 2016: House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 21, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor