+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 58
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pmobject
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: IR - Lovas
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Insurance and Retirement: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Insurance and Retirement
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Insurance and Retirement
House Adopted Amendment
Insurance and Retirement
House Proposed Amendment
Insurance and Retirement
House Proposed Amendment
Insurance and Retirement
House Adopted Amendment
2-24 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2014: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 10, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2014: Insurance and Retirement: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor