+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 278
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Crandell flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
- Amendment withdrawn: Floor Amend to Bill - Carter
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Crandell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Crandell flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-27 ed_aspassedcommittee
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 23, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 6
April 22, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2014: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor