+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 2, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 273
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On June 21, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Harper flr amend (ref GOV)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass amended
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: CMMA
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
Harper Floor Amendment, reference to GOV amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Harper Floor Amendment, reference to GOV amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
3-27 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
3-14 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
June 20, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 10
April 12, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
February 21, 2007: Government: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 20, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
January 18, 2007: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 18, 2007: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor