+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on the consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
March 13, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 21, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 18, 2018: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 18, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor