+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Payne moved that the House reconsider HB 2328 within the next 14 days. Motion failed by s/v 29-29.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: FAILED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- SUB Floor Amend to PS - Payne - passed
- PS
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 46
January 29, 2019: House Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 29, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7