+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Livingston moved that the House reconsider HB 2327 on Final Reading on Wednesday, April 23, 2014. Motion passed by v/v: 04/24/14
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Vote detail 36 18 6 0 passed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Failed
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Livingston
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:29 pmobject
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (12)
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Livingston Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Livingston Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-17 jud_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
3-6 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 21, 2014: House final read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 5
April 21, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 7
February 26, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor