+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Amendment adopted: Gorman flr amend #2 (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Gorman flr amend #1 (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RRD (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Retirement and Rural Development: Do pass amended
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Retirement and Rural Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:15 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Public Employees, Retirement and Entitlement Reform: Do pass
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Employees, Retirement and Entitlement Reform
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Gorman Floor Amendment #2; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gorman Floor Amendment #1; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Retirement and Rural Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Retirement and Rural Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Gorman Floor Amendment #2; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Retirement and Rural Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Retirement and Rural Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 16, 2009: Retirement and Rural Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
January 26, 2009: Public Employees, Retirement and Entitlement Reform: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 26, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor