+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- County and Municipal Affairs: Do pass
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: County and Municipal Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 2015: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 12, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2015: County and Municipal Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9