+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 76
- Action: Signed
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 5, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Senate first read
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment: RULES - w/d
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to COM - Reagan
- Amendment: COM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendments (12)
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Reagan SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment, reference to the COMMERCE Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Reagan SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment, reference to the COMMERCE Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-15 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
3-20 corrected caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 10, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
April 3, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2007: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
February 26, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2007: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 22, 2007: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor