+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 34
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pm
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: RULES
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 19, 2014: Public Safety: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 22, 2014: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2014: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor