+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 114
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions: Do pass
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: BFS - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to BFS - Weninger
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Banking and Financial Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Financial Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Banking and Financial Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Banking and Financial Services
House Proposed Amendment
Floor Amend to BFS - Weninger - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Banking and Financial Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2015: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 26, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 27, 2015: Banking and Financial Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2