+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 16, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 75
- Action: Signed
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 10, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 11:55 am
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Water and Agriculture: Do pass
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Water and Agriculture
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-12 nrra
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2007: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 19, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
January 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 22, 2007: Water and Agriculture: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2