+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: withdrawn.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to CJR - Toma - passed
- Amended by CJR - passed as amended
- Amended by APPROP - withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Criminal Justice Reform Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Criminal Justice Reform Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
January 26, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
January 26, 2021: House Criminal Justice Reform Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8