+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Retirement
- Senate first read
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to FII - McLain
- Amendment: FII
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Financial Institutions and Insurance: Do pass amended
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions and Insurance
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Financial Institutions and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
McLain Substitute Floor amendment to the Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
McLain Substitute Floor amendment to the Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions and Insurance
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
January 18, 2007: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 18, 2007: Financial Institutions and Insurance: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 18, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3