+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Ge
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2014: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor